This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/23/2019 at 07:32:32 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs Roberto Hatch et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Roberto Hatch. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5875

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendants

Hatch, Roberto A

Radilla, Uliana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennard, Robert S.

Sleezer, Kristen

Helfrick, Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order - Comment: Order on Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP 664.6, Signed by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Stipulation - Comment: for Entry of Judgment Conditional Dismissal Pursuant to CCP 664.6 **Tickler set for Dismissal After Pmts.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice to Appear at Trial and to Produce Books, Documents or Other Things (as to Defendant Uliana Radilla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice - Comment: to compel attendance before the Court and to produce books, docs or other things as to def Roberto A. Hatch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Exhibit List (Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Brief: Trial - Comment: Plaintiff's Opening Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: To Complaint; (Pro Per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: To Complaint ; Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: for defendant Uliana Radilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: for defendant Roberto A Hatch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less