This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 06:54:30 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs Frank Valtierra

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Frank Valtierra. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5881

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendant

Valtierra, Frank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC; Awarded Against: Valtierra, Frank; Amount; Damages: $7,308.86; Pre-Judgment Interest: $607.94; Attorney Fees: $1,238.00; Costs: $315.22; Total: $9470.02; Party: Names: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC; Valtierra, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Judgment - Comment: $9,470.02, granted by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Noticeto Appear at Trial and to Produce Books, Documents or Other Things

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Exhibit List (Party) - Comment: Plaintiff's Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Brief: Trial - Comment: Plaintiff's Opening Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: Granted by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • General Denial: Limited < $10K - Comment: To complaint, Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less