This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 06:28:17 (UTC).

Fnu Shubangini vs Sailesh Pallapothu

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Fnu Shubangini filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against Sailesh Pallapothu. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1201

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fnu Shubangini

Respondent

Sailesh Pallapothu

Other

OFFICE OF PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Madan Ahluwalia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Other w/fee; Department: Department 76; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Sailesh Pallapothu,; Comment: POS Mail (RFO hearing date 1/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Sailesh Pallapothu,; Comment: Memorandum: Points and Authorities (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Bifurcate; Filed By: Sailesh Pallapothu,; Comment: Request for Order: Bifurcate - $60.00 (Orders)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Sailesh Pallapothu,; Comment: Declaration (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,; Comment: Proof of Service - ($ 0)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Subsequent Request: DVRO w/o Minor; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini, Sailesh Pallapothu,; Comment: partly granted/denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order (Initial); Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,; Comment: (P)-property control, ss, atty fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Legal Separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Property; Comment: separate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Property; Comment: community

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Fnu Shubangini,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less