Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 06:08:37 (UTC).

Flores v. VP Security Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Flores filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VP Security Services, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9924

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores, Jessica

Defendant

VP Security Services, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Hyun, Dennis Sangwon

Marder, William L.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Civil: Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Civil

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed: Comment: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) PAGA representative action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 4/19/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Civil: Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed: Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARDER, WILLIAM L