This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 18:08:04 (UTC).

Flores v. Healthy Living At Home-Fresno, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Flores filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Healthy Living At Home-Fresno, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5461

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores, Rosa

Defendant

HEALTHY LIVING AT HOME- FRESNO, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Treglio, James Michael

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

Dismissal Without Prejudice of Entire Action: Comment: Request for Dismissal

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 5/20/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D1); assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) PAGA enforcement action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 1/27/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Flores, Rosa; HEALTHY LIVING AT HOME- FRESNO, LLC; Superior Court of California; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Dismissal Without Prejudice of Entire Action: Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 5/20/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D1); assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant