This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 17:58:08 (UTC).

Fireside Bank vs R. Torres

Case Summary

On 02/25/2010 Fireside Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R Torres. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham, Ray E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4740

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cunningham, Ray E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fireside Bank

Defendants

Rosa Torres

Torres, Rosa

Not Classified By Court

Added In Error

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Prenovost

2122 North Broadway, Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

Prenovost, Thomas J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = Santa Clara, issued 07/12/10 - deficit $14,044.80 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis Decision = M Closed = 11/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = cost-$47.00; credit-$0.00; interest-$196.68 mailed 06/30/10 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = $16,538.06 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil); Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Jgmt w/Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = total judgment $16,269.38 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = cost - $415.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Interest; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 585; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = file to judge/d190 Legacy Name = CV Default Pending Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 04/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Fireside Bank, Rosa Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRESIDE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRENOVOST THOMAS J