This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 17:04:29 (UTC).

FIA Card Services, N.A. vs A. Barriga

Case Summary

On 04/05/2010 FIA Card Services, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A Barriga. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham, Ray E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4849

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cunningham, Ray E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fia Card Services, N.A.

Defendants

Antonio Barriga

Barriga, Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur Tessimond

1320 Willow Pass Road, Suite 730

Concord, CA 94520

Tessimond, Arthur

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Barriga, Antonio; Party: Name: FIA Card Services, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Judge, Inactive; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Barriga, Antonio; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: FIA Card Services, N.A.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FIA Card Services, N.A.; Judgment Amount: $23,363.98; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Barriga, Antonio; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $399.50; Other: $22,964.48; Total: $23363.98; Comment: clerkid=380; printdate=Jun 8 2010; freetext=total judgment $23,363.98; origjudgdate=Jun 8 2010; judgstatusdate=Jun 8 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Los Angeles, issued 02/03/12 - deficit $19,132.65 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Los Angeles $23,573.98 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = cost-$185.00, credit-$0.00, interest-$0.00 mailed 01/18/12 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Los Angeles County $23438.98 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = costs $50.00 credit $0.00 interest $0.00 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = total judgment $23,363.98 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = without prejudice; please dismiss as to does 1 to 10 only. (Atty Brown) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = cost - $399.50 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TESSIMOND, ARTHUR