This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 18:14:32 (UTC).

Fernando Delgado vs Maria Delgado

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Fernando Delgado filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Maria Delgado. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8191

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delgado, Fernando

Defendant

Delgado, Maria Teresa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chang, Randy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY