This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 03:27:46 (UTC).

Ferguson Enterprises LLC et al vs Gary Morrow et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Ferguson Enterprises LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gary Morrow. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0209

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ferguson Enterprises LLC

Cal-Steam

Ferguson Enterprises Inc.

Defendants

Morrow, Gary M

Grade A Plumbing Services Inc.

Gary M Morrow

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gaba, Rudy, Jr.

Rudy Gaba

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/13/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

12/13/2019 Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/27/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/27/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Default Entered

2/3/2020 Default Entered

Request: Dismissal

2/3/2020 Request: Dismissal

Declaration

2/3/2020 Declaration

Declaration

2/3/2020 Declaration

Order: Default Judgment not entered

4/30/2020 Order: Default Judgment not entered

Proof of Service: Mail

7/16/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service: Mail

7/16/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Default Entered

7/16/2020 Default Entered

Declaration: Interest

7/16/2020 Declaration: Interest

Judgment: Default

7/31/2020 Judgment: Default

Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

11/9/2020 Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

Memorandum of Costs

12/2/2020 Memorandum of Costs

Judgment: Satisfaction

6/10/2021 Judgment: Satisfaction

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC, Gary Morrow, Grade A Plumbing Services Inc.,; Comment: Fully Satisfied, Los Angeles, Issued 1/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Satisfaction; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: in FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: Los Angeles, $14624.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Gary Morrow, Grade A Plumbing Services Inc., Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: $14,105.80 (Eserved 7/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Gary Morrow, Grade A Plumbing Services Inc., Ferguson Enterprises LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC, Gary Morrow, Grade A Plumbing Services Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: DECLARATION OF RODOLFO GABA, JR., IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,; Comment: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585 (D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC, Grade A Plumbing Services Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC, Gary Morrow,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL STEAM COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GRADE A METALS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO