This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/01/2022 at 07:07:46 (UTC).

Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. vs P. Dore

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 Ferguson Enterprises, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against P Dore. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucas, Patricia M, Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8917

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucas, Patricia M

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.

Air Cold Supply

Defendants

Philip Andrew Dore

1ST & Rosemary Senior Housing, L.P.

Citibank, Na

Roem-Icon Contracting Group, Inc.

Travelers Casualty And Travelers Company Of America

Dore, Philip Andrew

Reliable Air Mechanical

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael I. Wayne

1880 Century Park East, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1621

Wayne, Michael I.

Michael Ian Wayne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2014
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.,; Comment: Text = ATTY MICHAEL I. WAYNE Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 12/05/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Set for: OSC/Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Order: Default Judgment not entered; Comment: Text = Your judgment document is being returned unsigned due to: Y+The Court requeires live testimony in this action. Apply for a "prove-up" hrng date. Ordered by Judge Kirwan. Legacy Name = CV Ord:Rejection Letter Decision = D Closed = 08/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Set for:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Heard: Dismised

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.,; Comment: Text = of Michael I. Wayne Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore,; Comment: Text = Court Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 08/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore,; Comment: Text = of Christine Silva in lieu of testimony in support of default jgmt Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 08/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 13; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Set for: OSC/Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., 1st & Rosemary Senior Housing, L.P.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., ROEM-ICON Contracting Group, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Travelers Casualty And Travelers Company Of America,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Lis Pendens; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lis Pendens Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.,; Comment: Text = of CMC Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore, 1st & Rosemary Senior Housing, L.P., Citibank, NA, ROEM-ICON Contracting Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty And Travelers Company Of America,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore, 1st & Rosemary Senior Housing, L.P., Citibank, NA, ROEM-ICON Contracting Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty And Travelers Company Of America,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 01/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Philip Dore, 1st & Rosemary Senior Housing, L.P., Citibank, NA, ROEM-ICON Contracting Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty And Travelers Company Of America,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1st and Rosemary Family Housing LP is a litigant

Latest cases where ROEM-ICON CONTRACTING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIR COLD SUPPLY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant