Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:56:00 (UTC).

Felipe Pina vs Du Lam et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Felipe Pina filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Du Lam. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2508

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pina, Felipe Avita

Defendants

Liem, Lam

Lam, Du Linh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ounjian, Robert John

Defendant Attorney

Carlson, Amy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: C/F 4-11-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited by atty Carlson for defendants Du Lam and Liem Lam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less