This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:26:59 (UTC).

Felipa Limones vs Hilario Chamu

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 Felipa Limones filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Hilario Chamu. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pegg, Lori E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3611

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pegg, Lori E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Limones, Felipa Remigio

Respondent

Chamu, Hilario Refugio

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pegg, Lori E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Limones, Felipa Remigio; Chamu, Hilario Refugio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS - Comment: (P) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Declaration for default filed - Comment: (P) disso-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Comment: (P) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of shared residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less