Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:14:14 (UTC).

Fastpencil, Inc. v. Arroyo

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Fastpencil, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arroyo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucas, Patricia M and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9044

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucas, Patricia M

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FASTPENCIL, INC

Defendant

ARROYO, DOUGLAS

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karic, Christopher Kresomir

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Not Complex

Order: Deeming Case Not Complex: Comment: signed/PML

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/28/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Deemed not complex on 4/6/21; matter is referred to the Civil Supervising Judge for reassignment; CMC to be reset upon reassignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order & Notice of Reassignment to Case Manager D7, Hon. Christopher G. Rudy presiding. Envelope #6234493; e-served 4/13/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Not Complex - Order: Deeming Case Not Complex: Comment: signed/PML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/28/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FASTPENCIL, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant