This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 12:42:56 (UTC).

Farhana Kazi vs Khalid Kazi

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Farhana Kazi filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Khalid Kazi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3942

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Farhana Kazi

Respondent

Khalid Ahmed Kazi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Asma Bashir

Respondent Attorney

Fred C. Begun

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Khalid Kazi,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Farhana Kazi ,; Comment: Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Khalid Kazi,; Comment: Response - Marriage/Domestic Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Farhana Kazi ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Farhana Kazi ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Other; Filed By: Farhana Kazi ,; Comment: Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Begun, Fred C.