This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 09:25:05 (UTC).

Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd. vs Ceva Freight, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ceva Freight, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Stoelker, James L. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3895

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd.

Defendants

Ceva Freight, LLC

Ceva Logistics U.S.

Ceva Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirsch, Joshua Erik

Defendant Attorney

Lerner, Neil S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Jurisdictional transfer (CV, JV, SC); Party: Names: Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd.; Ceva Freight, LLC; Ceva Logistics, LLC; Ceva Logistics U.S.; Comment: Ntc of Removal to Federal Court (Neil S. Lerner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Removal to Federal Court - Comment: Notice to Plaintiff and to the Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAILVEY CARGO UNDERWRITING LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where CEVA Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CEVA LOGISTICS U.S., INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ceva Freight, LLC is a litigant