Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:34:53 (UTC).

FAIRFIELD TURNLEAF L.P. vs Jeff Tucker et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by FAIRFIELD TURNLEAF L P against Jeff Tucker in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1924

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRFIELD TURNLEAF L.P.

Defendants

Tucker, Jeff

Cobb, Tammi

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: FAIRFIELD TURNLEAF L.P.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3201 Loma Verde Drive #92, San Jose, CA 95117; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: Tucker, Jeff; Cobb, Tammi; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,196.00; Holdover Damages: $1,098.00; Attorney Fees: $565.00; Costs: $450.00; Total: $4,309.00; Party: Names: FAIRFIELD TURNLEAF L.P.; Tucker, Jeff; Cobb, Tammi; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: 9/19/18, Santa Clara, Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 3201 Loma Verde Drive #92, San Jose, CA 95117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Trial: Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Judgment - Comment: 3201 Loma Verde Drive #92, San Jose, CA 95117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: ALL UKNOWN OCCUPANTS- PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: JEFF TUCKER- NO PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: TAMMI COBB- NO PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • General Denial: Limited < $10K - Comment: Pro Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less