This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/26/2022 at 09:10:34 (UTC).

F. Martin vs DKD Property Management Co.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2013 F Martin filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DKD Property Management Co. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kula, Allyn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3351

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kula, Allyn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Martin

Martin, Frank

Defendants

Dkd Property Management Co

Dkd Property Management Co.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2013
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: DKD Property Management Co.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Comment: Text = Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge Allyn Kula Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Comment: Text = Judgment: Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. by pro tem Allyn Kula Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Frank Martin,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000; Filed By: Frank Martin, DKD Property Management Co.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less