This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 10:47:21 (UTC).

F. Jahan vs M. Laschinger

Case Summary

On 09/16/2010 F Jahan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Laschinger. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Norris, Laura Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1346

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Norris, Laura Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Faaizah Jahan

Castro Valley, CA 94552

Steven Vaniman

Castro Valley, CA 94552

Vaniman, Steven

Jahan, Faaizah

Defendants

Mike Laschinger

San Jose, CA 95128

Elizabeth Skinner

San Jose, CA 95128

Principal Propert Management

Laschinger, Mike

Skinner, Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Vaniman, Steven; Party: Name: Skinner, Elizabeth; Party: Name: Laschinger, Mike; Party: Name: Jahan, Faaizah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Norris, Laura Lee; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Vaniman, Steven; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Skinner, Elizabeth; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Jahan, Faaizah; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Vaniman, Steven; Judgment Amount: $306.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Skinner, Elizabeth; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $140.00; Other: $166.00; Total: $306.00; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Mar 11 2011; freetext=Judgment against Elizabeth Skinner - only. Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim as to Defendant Mike Laschinger - only; origjudgdate=Mar 10 2011; judgstatusdate=Mar 11 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Laschinger, Mike; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Jahan, Faaizah; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Heard: Decision on Submitted Matter; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LLN - Norris, Laura Result Date = 03/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 01/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/01/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 11/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 11/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = served DEFENDANT'S CLAIM Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Cert mail; pos on COD. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 09/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $7,500.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.