This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:11:15 (UTC).

F. Grengo vs L. Wiley

Case Summary

On 01/28/2010 F Grengo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against L Wiley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Mackin McCarthy, Kristine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8201

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Michael Grengo

Saratoga, CA 95070

Grengo, Frank Michael

Defendants

Lisa Wiley

Milpitas, CA 95035

Wiley, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Wiley, Lisa; Party: Name: Grengo, Frank Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Wiley, Lisa; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Grengo, Frank Michael; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Grengo, Frank Michael; Judgment Amount: $1,870.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Wiley, Lisa; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $75.00; Other: $1,795.00; Total: $1870.00; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Aug 9 2010; freetext=check 0341 canceled by judgment; heard w/710SC38204; origjudgdate=Aug 4 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 9 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Wiley, Lisa; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Grengo, Frank Michael; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = BW issued for Lisa Wiley, bail set at $ 3,000.00, debtor to post cash bail only, bail that can be applied. No written promise to appear & no walkover allowed. Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 07/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service; pos on OEX Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = oex signed & mailed back to creditor 5/11/11 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Mailed Order on Court Fee Waiver Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Granted - Filing papers in Superior Court only. Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 04/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 08/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = D Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 07/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = deft nonstip and rqt cont for witness Result By = D Result Judge = TE - Ellis, Terry Result Date = 06/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pers serv Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = Defendant will not waive service. Reset and serve. No POS. Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 04/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = fee waiver and service copy mailed to the plaintiff Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 01/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = fee waiver granted Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less