This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 18:44:56 (UTC).

F. Barez vs D. Silva

Case Summary

On 03/06/2008 F Barez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Silva. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5137

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Barez

Defendant

Douglass Silva

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: Warrant: Returned and Filed; Filed By: Fred Barez, Douglass Silva,; Comment: Text = warrant returned/filed Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant Returned & Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 8:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: Fred Barez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: Fred Barez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Heard: Debtor Sworn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: Fred Barez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Heard: Debtor Sworn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketDescription: Warrant: Returned and Filed; Filed By: Douglass Silva,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant Returned & Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SC-Ntc to Appear in Court Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Bench warrant order issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:45PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Douglass Silva,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: Fred Barez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam Closed = 08/05/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Douglass Silva,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: Fred Barez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 04/28/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less