This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 22:35:29 (UTC).

Extreme Towing Inc vs B. Lee, et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2010 Extreme Towing Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against B Lee. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiss, Franklyn, Mackin McCarthy, Kristine and Bondonno, Franklin E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9812

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiss, Franklyn

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

Bondonno, Franklin E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Extreme Towing Inc

Defendants

Brandon Lee

Lee Yeo Bai

Integrated MFG Tech

Lee, Brandon

Bai, Lee Yeo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Change of venue - transfer (CV, FL, JD, JV, MH, PR, SC); Party: Name: Bai, Lee Yeo; Party: Name: Lee, Brandon; Party: Name: Extreme Towing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Change of venue - transfer (CV, FL, JD, JV, MH, PR, SC); Party: Name: Bai, Lee Yeo; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lee, Brandon; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Extreme Towing Inc; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Extreme Towing Inc; Judgment Amount: $5,070.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Lee, Brandon; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $70.00; Other: $5,000.00; Total: $5070.00; Comment: printdate=Apr 15 2011; freetext=Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff in the sum of $5,000 plus $70. The Court further orders that Plaintiff Extreme Towing may dispose of the vehicle after consulting with the Santa Clara Probation Departement. The Court orders the exhibits r; origjudgdate=Apr 15 2011; judgstatusdate=Apr 15 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Weiss, Franklyn; Judgment Type: Change of venue - transfer (CV, FL, JD, JV, MH, PR, SC); Party: Name: Bai, Lee Yeo; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Lee, Brandon; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Extreme Towing Inc; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Extreme Towing Inc; Awarded Against: Lee, Brandon; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Oct 1 2010; freetext=Defendants Brandon Lee dba Integrated MFG Tech only shall pay plaintiff $5000.00 principal and $70.00 costs on plaintiff's claim. Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim as to Def Lee Yeo Bai only. Per Def's request; origjudgdate=Sep 23 2010; judgstatusdate=Oct 1 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Change of venue - transfer (CV, FL, JD, JV, MH, PR, SC); Party: Name: Bai, Lee Yeo; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lee, Brandon; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Extreme Towing Inc; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = OEX as to Brandon Lee. No appearance. Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 08/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = OEX as to Brandon Lee; set for 08/20/12 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = costs: $240.00, accrued interest: $106.96; date of mailing: 06/21/12 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Extreme Towing Inc vs B. Lee, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 07/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = certified mail for Brandon Lee, Return to Sender, Unclaimed Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = served Lee Yeo Bai, by certified mail Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 05/24/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 05/24/2010

    Read MoreRead Less