Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 14:02:10 (UTC).

EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management vs Alfred Redding et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 EBN Enterprise LLC , DBA Evergreen Management filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alfred Redding. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Steingart, Lisa and Storey, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2772

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Steingart, Lisa

Storey, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Evergreen Management

EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management

Defendants

Allen, Alfred

Deng, Li Jin

Liang, Min Hong

Redding, Alfred Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Awarded Against: Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Comment: Defendants Alfred Allen Redding; Li Jin Deng shall pay plaintiff $195.00 principal and $0 costs on plaintiff's claim. Plaintiff shall pay defendants Alfred Allen Redding; Li Jin Deng $2595.00 principal and $0 costs on defendant s claim. Defendant Min Hong Liang was previously dismissed on 3/21/18. Per Court: Plaintiff retained security deposit of $27900.00, thus the tenants are owed $2595.00. Each party pays their own costs. Judgment is joint and several as to the defendants. Lease is canceled.; Party: Names: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Liang, Min Hong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Awarded Against: Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Comment: Defendants Alfred Allen; Li Jin Deng shall pay plaintiff $195.00 principal and $0 costs on plaintiff's claim. Plaintiff shall pay defendants Alfred Allen; Li Jin Deng $2595.00 principal and $0 costs on defendant s claim. Defendant Min Hong Liang was previously dismissed on 3/21/18. Per Court: Plaintiff retained security deposit of $27900.00, thus the tenants are owed $2595.00. Each party pays their own costs. Judgment is joint and several as to the defendants. Lease is canceled.; Party: Names: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Liang, Min Hong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Awarded Against: Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Comment: Defendants Alfred Allen; Li Jin Deng shall pay plaintiff $195.00 principal and $0 costs on plaintiff's claim. Plaintiff shall pay defendants Alfred Allen; Li Jin Deng $2595.00 principal and $0 costs on defendant s claim. Defendant Min Hong Liang was previously dismissed on 3/21/18. Per Court: Plaintiff retained security deposit of $27900.00, thus the tenants are owed $2595.00. Each party pays their own costs. Judgment is joint and several as to the defendants.; Party: Names: EBN Enterprise LLC., DBA: Evergreen Management; Redding, Alfred Allen; Deng, Li Jin; Liang, Min Hong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Request - Comment: for Funds by Judgment Creditor - sent to accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Comment: Paid judgment to Court in Full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 6/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) - Comment: 2nd Amended. Mailed 8/22/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) - Comment: Amended. Mailed 8/21/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: as to Defendat Liang only per 03/21/2018 minute order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Comment: For: Lijin Deng.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less