This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:34 (UTC).

Eva Moreno vs Hector Moreno Jr.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Eva Moreno filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Hector Moreno Jr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1272

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moreno, Eva Sausedo

Respondent

Moreno Jr., Hector Abel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: FL-100; FL-110; FL-120;...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less