Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:51 (UTC).

Esther Eames, LLC vs Mohammed Rezaian et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Esther Eames, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mohammed Rezaian. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2505

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esther Eames, LLC

Defendants

Maximo Investments, LLC

DeMontfort, LLC

Rezaian, Mohammed

1 through 100, Does

Navone, Michael

DASH Strategies, LLC

Sowers, John

Courthouse Ventures, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, John Marshall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Esther Eames, LLC; Rezaian, Mohammed; Sowers, John; Navone, Michael; 1 through 100, Does; DeMontfort, LLC; Maximo Investments, LLC; Courthouse Ventures, Inc.; DASH Strategies, LLC; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: FIRST AMENDED; ATTY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESTHER EAMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COURTHOUSE VENTURES,INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant