This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 18:12:39 (UTC).

Estella Hernandez vs J Jesus Martinez

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 Estella Hernandez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against J Jesus Martinez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, Stuart J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3376

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, Stuart J

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Hernandez, Estella G

Estella G Hernandez

Respondents

Martinez, J Jesus

J Jesus Martinez

Minors

Martinez, Jonathan Antonio

Martinez, Jared Alexander

Jared Alexander Martinez

Jonathan Antonio Martinez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final); Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,; Comment: Granted > to Judgment Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Estella Hernandez,

    Read MoreRead Less