This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:00 (UTC).

Estee Lee et al vs Hector Jauregui

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Estee Lee filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hector Jauregui. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Copeland, Christine and Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3540

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Copeland, Christine

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yee, Minae

Lee, Estee

Defendant

Jauregui, Hector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Names: Lee, Estee; Yee, Minae; Jauregui, Hector; Comment: Dismissed in Court without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Paid $ 50.00 - No POS as of 12/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fee Paid $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less