This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 03:07:10 (UTC).

Estate of Susan Moody

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Estate of Susan Moody was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3599

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

William A Moody

Decedent

Susan Moody

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

James Maurice Sullivan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Spousal Property Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Petition: Spousal Property; Department: Department 13; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: William Moody,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: William Moody,; Comment: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Filed By: William Moody,; Comment: Petition for Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Filed By: William Moody,; Comment: Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less