Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:33 (UTC).

Estate of Robert Murray

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Estate of Robert Murray was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4073

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Murray, Barbara W.

Decedent

Murray, Robert G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Khayat, Darius

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Order - Comment: Spousal Property Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Petition: Spousal Property - Original Type: Petition: Spousal Property; Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Darius Khayat 760-591-0245)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust - Comment: Notice Of Hearing- Revised

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition (No Fee) - Comment: Petition- Spousal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Probate Other (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less