This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 04:27:06 (UTC).

Estate of Peter Ellenberger

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Estate of Peter Ellenberger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3356

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eric Pfeffer

Decedent

Peter Jurg Ellenberger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Janet Lee Brewer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Notice of Remote Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to Creditors; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Notice of Administration to Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letters: Admin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Administrator; Comment: Full Auth; bond is not required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Probate Referee; Comment: Lance E Bayer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: 2022-12-08 Declaration of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Letters of Administration; Department: Department 5; Time: 9:01AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: HRG 12/8/2022 Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Proof of Publication; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Duties and Liabilities; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: HRG 12/08/2022 Duties and Liabilities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Probate Other (First); Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Petition for Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Filed By: Eric Pfeffer,; Comment: Notice of Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less