This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/01/2019 at 06:55:07 (UTC).

Estate of Max Rodriguez, III

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Estate of Max Rodriguez, III was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Emede, Julie A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4548

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gutierrez, Jess

Decedent

Rodriguez, Maximo C, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DelPonte, Dennis William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Dennis Del Ponte 408-294-4525)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Supervision Termination - Approval of final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Order - Comment: Judgement on Waiver of Accounting on Report of Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Waiver - Comment: Waiver of Account by Distributee (Max)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Waiver - Comment: Waiver of Account by Distributee (Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Accounting - Subsequent petition filed - Comment: Petition for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of Attorney Dennis W. Del Ponte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Amended Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice: Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition (No Fee) - Comment: Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less