This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:39 (UTC).

Estate of Mary Jourdan

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Estate of Mary Jourdan was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Emede, Julie A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4547

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kiem, Barbara J

Decedent

Jourdan, Mary Frances

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • Hearing: Accounting/Final Distribution - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: (Barbara Kiem 650-324-8502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 11-15-19 Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Petition - Comment: HRG 11-15-19 Petition for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Comment: Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Hearing: Will/Letters Testamentary - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Barbara Kiem (650-324-8502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Under Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Order: Appoint Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Letters: Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Order: Appoint Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: HRG 1-18-19 Notice of Hearing - Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; HRG 1/18/19; San Jose Mercury News

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: HRG 1-18-19 Proposed Order for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities - Comment: HRG 1-18-19 Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 1-18-19 Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition (No Fee) - Comment: HRG 1-18-19 Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less