This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 12:22:40 (UTC).

Estate of Maria Nava

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Estate of Maria Nava was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Emede, Julie A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9236

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Nava, Ruth

Spoulos, Esther

Ruth Nava

Esther Spoulos

Decedents

Nava, Maria Jesus Rubio

Maria Jesus Rubio Nava

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Begun, Fred C.

Fred C. Begun

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Other subsequent; Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: First and Final Account and Report of Administration and Petition for Settlement Thereof;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proposed Order: MSOP Judge 1; Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: Proposed Order (Cover Sheet)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letters: Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Inventory and Appraisal; Filed By: Ruth Nava,; Comment: INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Probate Referee; Comment: Wayne Horiuchi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Will/Letters Testamentary; Department: Department 13; Time: 9:01AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Proof of Publication; Filed By: Ruth Nava,; Comment: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust; Filed By: Ruth Nava,; Comment: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Ruth Nava,; Comment: SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Ruth Nava,; Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Will/Letters Testamentary; Department: Department 13; Time: 9:01AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Duties and Liabilities; Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative (Probate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust; Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate-Decedents' Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition (No Fee); Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: Petition for Probate (Probate-Decedents Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: Ruth Nava, Esther Spoulos,; Comment: Order for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Begun, Fred C.