Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:08:03 (UTC).

Estate of Larry Krieger

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 Estate of Larry Krieger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Persky, Aaron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2054

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Persky, Aaron

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Krieger, Anna Sue

Decedent

Krieger, Larry D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ruschin, Timothy L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • Petition: Spousal Property - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: (Timothy Ruschin 295-0603)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Supplemental Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of E-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Petition Filed - Comment: Spousal Property Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Petition: Probate Other (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Ruschin