This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 16:45:25 (UTC).

Estate of Katherine Du bois

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 Estate of Katherine Du bois was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2966

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Du Bois, Dale E

Not Classified By Court

Platteter, Robert

Ernstron, Patricia

Ernstrom, Natalie

The President and Board of Trustes of Santa Clara College

Notre Dame de Namur Univrsity

Platteter, Steven

Decedent

Du bois, Katherine A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Schneider, Daniel James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Order - Comment: spousal order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: amended. spousal property (David Arata 297-6004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: PENDING 5-17-18 HEARING RE: CONT. REQ. SUB. BY MP ON 5-10-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Hearing: Petition - Original Type: Hearing: Petition; Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Plaintiff; Comment: (David Arata 297-6004), C/F 5-17-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Amended Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Petition: Amended - Comment: Petition: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Last Will & Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Petition (No Fee) - Comment: Spousal property Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Petition: Probate Other (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schneider, Daniel James