Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 19:13:45 (UTC).

Estate of John Rehling

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Estate of John Rehling was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Emede, Julie A and Lie, Cynthia C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6564

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Emede, Julie A

Lie, Cynthia C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rehling, Mark

Claimants

Department of Health Services

County of Santa clara

Decedent

Rehling, John C.

Interested Party

Inheritance Funding Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ruschin, Timothy L.

Interested Party Attorney

Schroeder, Steven Dale

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Money into Blocked Acct

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Mark J Rehlings Assignment 5, sale and transfer of beneficial interest in decedents estate to inheritance funding company, inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Mark J Rehlings Assignment 4, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest in Decedents Estate to Inheritance Funding Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder: Deposit into Blocked Account - Comment: $71,677.13 + interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder: Deposit into Blocked Account - Comment: $235,287.34 & 100.39 + interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Inventory and Appraisal & proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest: Special Notice (Probate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketClaim: Creditor - Comment: Total Amount of Claim: $86,347.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Mark Rehlings Assignment 3

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Supplemental Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAffidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketOrder: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest: Special Notice - Comment: Request for Special Notice for the Estate of John C. Rehling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDocument: Other - Comment: Mark J Rehlings Assignment 1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest in Decedents Estate to Inheritance Funding Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketPetition (No Fee) - Comment: Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE