This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 13:43:53 (UTC).

Estate of John Fitzgerald

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Estate of John Fitzgerald was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pegg, Lori E and Lie, Cynthia C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9278

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pegg, Lori E

Lie, Cynthia C

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Fitzgerald, Whitney

Fitzgerald, Carolyn

Fitzgerald, June

Carolyn Fitzgerald

Whitney Fitzgerald

June Fitzgerald

Decedents

Fitzgerald, John Thomas

John Thomas Fitzgerald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Leahy, Daniel J

Sowards, Benjamin James

Daniel J Leahy

Benjamin James Sowards

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order on Petition for Determination of Community Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Order on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Comment: Petition for Determination of Community Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Evidentiary; Department: Department 5; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Evidentiary; Department: Department 5; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Brief: Trial; Filed By: Carolyn Fitzgerald, Whitney Fitzgerald,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Carolyn Fitzgerald, Whitney Fitzgerald,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Carolyn Fitzgerald, Whitney Fitzgerald,

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition; Filed By: June Fitzgerald,; Comment: Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust; Filed By: June Fitzgerald,; Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition; Filed By: June Fitzgerald,; Comment: Petition for Determination of Community Property Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust; Filed By: June Fitzgerald,; Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed; Filed By: June Fitzgerald,; Comment: Spousal Property Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Duties and Liabilities; Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust; Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition (No Fee); Comment: Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leahy, Daniel J., Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sowards, Benjamin James