This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:13 (UTC).

Estate of Joe Beck

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Estate of Joe Beck was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2623

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Beck, Michael J

Gummow, Cheryl L

Decedent

Beck, Joe M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Order: Final Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Order - Comment: of Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution - Original Type: Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution; Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Michael Beck 209-815-8994)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Supervision Termination - Approval of final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Waiver - Comment: of Notice of Proposed Action w/ POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of Michael J. Beck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust - Comment: A Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Order: Appoint Probate Referee - Comment: Wayne K Horiuchi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Letters: Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Order: Appoint Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of Michael J Beck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Probate Will/Letters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less