This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 07:04:51 (UTC).

Estate of Daniel Shattuc

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Estate of Daniel Shattuc was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9508

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Good Shepherd Fund

Claimant

Crosby & Crosby, A Professional Law Corporation

Decedent

Daniel Orris Shattuc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lorna Jean Drope

Claimant Attorney

Michael Cook Crosby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Claim: Creditor; Filed By: Crosby & Crosby, A Professional Law Corporation,; Comment: Creditor's Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Inventory and Appraisal; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Inventory and Appraisal - Shattuc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Proposed Action/Objection/Consent; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Consent to Notice of Proposed Action - Shattuc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Proposed Action/Objection/Consent; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Notice of Proposed Action - Shattuc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: NOPA - Proof of Service - Shattuc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: NOPA - Proof of Electronic Service - Shattuc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Administrator; Comment: Full Authority , Bond is Not Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Appoint Probate Referee; Comment: Lance Bayer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letters: Admin with Will Annexed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Ex Parte Hearing, Contested; Department: Department 13; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Special Letters Administration w/o powers of gener; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application; Comment: Ex Parte for Order Granting Petition for Letter of Special Admin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: of Ex Parte and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Comment: Re: Ex Parte Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Duties and Liabilities; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Filed By: The Good Shepherd Fund,; Comment: Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less