This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:25 (UTC).

Estate of Chikako Cutlip

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Estate of Chikako Cutlip was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pichon, Rise Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2619

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pichon, Rise Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cutlip, Chikako K

Decedent

Cutlip, Chikako Kuniyoshi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Hearing: Letters of Administration - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Party's Motion; Comment: (Chikako Cutlip 614-1248), C/F 5-14-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Notice: Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 5/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Other - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Probate Will/Letters Testamentary - Comment: Customer needs to bring in Notice of hearing to schedule hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less