Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 18:52:09 (UTC).

Estate of Brett Hunter

Case Summary

On 03/14/2016 Estate of Brett Hunter was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8412

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Phillips, Ruby E.

Decedent

Hunter, Brett W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ruschin, Timothy Leigh

Piedra, Julie Ruschin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution - Original Type: Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution; Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: (Timothy Ruschin 408-295-0603)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Order: Final Distribution - Comment: waiver of account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: of Attorney Submitted for Clarity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Petition - Comment: Petition for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: EXAMINER NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Order: Appoint Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Order: Appoint Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Letters: Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Ntc of Pet to ADM 5/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Last Will & Testament - Comment: 1/14/86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Petition: Probate Will/Letters Testamentary - Comment: $465pd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Notice: Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: hrg 5/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruschin Piedra, Julie E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Ruschin