Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:00:48 (UTC).

Estate of Andrew Lai

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Estate of Andrew Lai was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4072

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lai, Chia-Saun

Decedent

Lai, Andrew Eong-Lip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bhandari, Sumita

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • Hearing: Letters of Administration - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Sumtia Bhanfari 925-837-0585) C/F 10/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Order - Comment: to Confirm Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Petition - Comment: Ex Parte for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Hearing: Letters of Administration - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Party's Motion; Comment: Sumtia Bhanfari 925-837-0585)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 10/24/2018 Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: HRG 10/24/2018 Proof of Service of Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 10/24/18 Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Petition: Amended - Comment: Petition: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Cover Sheet and Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Probate Other (First) - Comment: Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less