This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:10 (UTC).

Esha Pathak vs Manas Pathak

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Esha Pathak filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Manas Pathak. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lie, Cynthia C and Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3888

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lie, Cynthia C

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pathak, Esha

Respondent

Pathak, Manas

Minor

Pathak, Aditya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Patton, David Alan

Respondent Attorney

Brass, Bethany M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Request for Order: Custody/Support - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (p) initial c/c, c/s, s/s, a/f [set ok per lp]-pjn;c /f 11/28/18; reissue-lci

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Order - Comment: PET Order on Request to Continue Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Request for Order: Reissuance - Comment: PET Request to Continue Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: iso ptr's rfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: dec of David A Patton, esq iso ptr's rfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: PET Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: (p) initial c/c, c/s, s/s, a/f [set ok per lp]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less