Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/21/2020 at 12:03:41 (UTC).

Eric Kirkland vs Philip Cancila

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Eric Kirkland filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Philip Cancila. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7307

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirkland, Eric

Defendant

Cancila, Philip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prybylo, Garrett

Defendant Attorney

Rice, Richard Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketBulk Scanned Documents - Comment: From 1/15/2020 to 3/16/2020 (Compendium of Evidence re: Motion to Change Venue, Minute Order, Register of Actions)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketBulk Scanned Documents - Comment: From 9/9/2019 to 1/15/2020 (Complaint Packet & Motion to Change Venue)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketTransfer In - Comment: *NO 1ST PAPER FEES REQUIRED*

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrett Michael Prybylo