This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 19:14:55 (UTC).

Emma Hildebrand vs City of Santa Clara et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 Emma Hildebrand filed an Other lawsuit against City of Santa Clara. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1733

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hildebrand, Emma Mae

Emma Mae Hildebrand

Defendants

FPI Management Inc.

Roem Builders

Housing Authority of the City of Santa Clara

2525 El Camino Senior Apartments

City of Santa Clara

Carabello, Leigh Ann

Camino Del Rey Senior Apartments

Dewey Pest Control Company

Roem Inc.

Phen, Micki

Leigh Ann Carabello

Micki Phen

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver Order-Grant

1/17/2018 Fee Waiver Order-Grant

Clerk Rejection Letter

1/12/2018 Clerk Rejection Letter

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/12/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Comment: No Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Comment: No civil case cover sheet filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camino Del Rey Senior Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where DEWEY PEST CONTROL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant