This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 13:22:18 (UTC).

Emily Masuda vs LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Emily Masuda filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4170

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Masuda, Emily

Defendants

LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD

STANFORD HEALTH CARE

STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Setareh, Shaun

Defendant Attorney

Bruno, Michael David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer: Amended Complaint - Comment: to FAC. Atty Bruno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: env #5749770- Please attach $150 for jury fees and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended Complaint atty Setareh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Declaration: FAF is required from responding party ($435/ea)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (STANFORD HEALTH CARE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING - GRANTED until 2-5-21 - signed by Judge Folan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanford Health Care Advantage is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant