This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 20:27:47 (UTC).

Emerita Sadioa et al vs Eduardo Miranda

Case Summary

On 02/24/2017 Emerita Sadioa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Eduardo Miranda. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6734

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emerita Sadioa

Melissa Griffin

Defendant

Eduardo Miranda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

My N Nguyen

Defendant Attorney

John Burke

 

Court Documents

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/21/2019 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/21/2019 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/21/2019 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

2/21/2019 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Conference: Further Case Management

1/30/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

1/30/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

1/30/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

1/30/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

11/16/2017 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

11/16/2017 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

11/16/2017 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Minute Order

3/20/2017 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/6/2017 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/13/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

11/21/2017 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/18/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

1/31/2018 Minute Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order After Hearing - POS; Filed By: My Nguyen, John Burke, Emerita Sadioa, Melissa Griffin, Eduardo Miranda, Emerita Sadioa,; Comment: Case is DISMISSED w/o prej (Judge Arand) hrg 2/21/19 10am *see for details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Emerita Sadioa,; Comment: Old Atty: My Nguyen / New Atty: Pro Se

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Compromise of Minor's Claim; Department: Department 9; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application; Filed By: Eduardo Miranda,; Comment: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application; Filed By: Emerita Sadioa,; Comment: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Partial; Filed By: Emerita Sadioa,; Comment: The court partially grants your request, you must pay 50% of your court fees. Signed by Judge Arand

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Emerita Sadioa,; Comment: on Fee Waiver. The court needs more information to decide whether to grant your request You must go to court on 3/20/17 2:15pm D9. Signed by Judge Arand

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Deny; Filed By: Melissa Griffin,; Comment: Denied, explain how you pay your bills, complete all of p.2 all household income and expenses must be disclosed. Signed by Judge Arand

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Melissa Griffin,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Emerita Sadioa,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less