This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:44:42 (UTC).

Emergency Services Restoration, Inc. vs V. Boyd

Case Summary

On 11/05/2010 Emergency Services Restoration, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against V Boyd. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mackin McCarthy, Kristine and Baum, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1981

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

Baum, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emergency Services Restoration, Inc.

4435 W. 153Rd St.

Lawndale, CA 90260

Defendants

Vallie J. Boyd

San Jose, CA 95121

Boyd, Vallie J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Boyd, Vallie J.; Party: Name: Emergency Services Restoration, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Baum, Gary; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Boyd, Vallie J.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Emergency Services Restoration, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Emergency Services Restoration, Inc.; Judgment Amount: $378.95; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Boyd, Vallie J.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $92.50; Other: $286.45; Total: $378.95; Comment: clerkid=627; printdate=Feb 28 2011; origjudgdate=Feb 22 2011; judgstatusdate=Feb 28 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Boyd, Vallie J.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Emergency Services Restoration, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Paid in full. Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 02/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 01/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Req rec'd less then 10 days prior to hearing date; req attached to file. Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Request to Postpone Trial. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 12/20/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Personal service; POS on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 11/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERGENCY SERVICES RESTORATION INC. is a litigant