This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 21:26:52 (UTC).

Elvira Hernandez and Benjamin Hernandez

Case Summary

On 04/06/2011 Elvira Hernandez and Benjamin Hernandez was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0906

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Elvira Hernandez

Respondent

Benjamin Hernandez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2012
  • HearingDescription: Request: Enter Default Judgment; Department: Family Department TBA; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Heard: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/Default; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/Default Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Elvira Hernandez and Benjamin Hernandez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Default/Uncontested Hearing; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Default/Uncontested Hrg Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Spousal Support; Department: Department 108; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar, no appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 108; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar, no appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 108; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketDescription: OSC: Spousal Support; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Text = terminate jurisdiction to award spousal support to respondent Legacy Name = FL OSC:Spousal Support Closed = 11/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 09/21/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 07/19/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/07/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Amended; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Amend Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003); Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Text = granted Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 04/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Elvira Hernandez,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benjamin Hernaez is a litigant