This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 03:31:46 (UTC).

ELENA OLSVOLD vs STANFORD HOSPITAL et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 ELENA OLSVOLD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against STANFORD HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7253

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELENA OLSVOLD

Defendants

STANFORD HOSPITAL

ANSON LEE

STANFORD HEALTH CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Michael Fitzsimmons

Defendant Attorney

Thomas E. Still

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/2/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration

11/2/2022 Declaration

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/2/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Request: Dismissal

1/20/2023 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

1/27/2023 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/30/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

1/31/2023 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/31/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/14/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 3:45PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: HRG: 4.4.23 Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,; Comment: to complaint: atty Still

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: STANFORD HEALTH CARE,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: HRG 4/4/23 Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: HRG: 4.4.23 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: PARTIAL w/o Prej as to Defs Stanford Hospital and Anson Lee, MD Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: Complaint for Damages (Survival Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: Declaration of Elena Olsvold, as the Successor-In-Interest to Decedent John Olsvold Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: ELENA OLSVOLD,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less