This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:53 (UTC).

Elaina Sunseri vs DBI Beverage Inc

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Elaina Sunseri filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DBI Beverage Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6069

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunseri, Elaina

Defendant

DBI Beverage Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Solomon, Michael Robert

Defendant Attorney

Roth, David Vincent

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 7-16-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 4/25/19 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 deposited for def DBI Beverage Inc. by atty: David Roth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Roth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less